Case: 06-20-00078-CV
06-20-00078-CV
10/15/2020
Personal Injury
Edward Cox and Theresa Cox
Franklin Micah May Vanderburg, Premier Land, LLC, and Cecilia Gutierrez De Cruz
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/22/2021 | Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief disp | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
04/22/2021 | Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
04/06/2021 | Order entered |
| |||||
03/15/2021 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
02/23/2021 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/12/2021 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
02/09/2021 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
10/16/2020 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
10/16/2020 | Fee paid | | |||||
10/15/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/24/2021 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Cox, Edward | Appellant | Jason C. Webster Steven E. Aldous Michael M. Gallagher |
Premier Land Liquidators, LLC | Appellee | Michael J. Shipman Andrew L. Petersen Kristi L. Kautz |
Trial Court Information
62nd District Court
Hopkins
Honorable Will Biard
CV43881
Anna M. Upchurch