judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES PINKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0187)
Case Number:S-07-0187Case Docketed On:08/14/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JAMES PINKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JAMES PINKER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames PinkerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments
Opinion Number:2008 WY 86
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/14/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/24/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/24/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/14/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/15/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/28/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
01/29/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/30/2008Event - Hardcopy received, brief of appellee and copy of designation of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/04/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/26/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/27/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/22/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/07/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/07/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/12/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 08/18/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal