judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GET LLC V. D.C. DEP'T OF HEALTH

Case Information: 10-AA-1060
Short Caption:GET LLC V. D.C. DEP'T OF HEALTHClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Dept of Health
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:OAH-DOH56-09Filed Date:08/26/2010

Opening Event Date:08/26/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/21/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerGet LLCNPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of HealthN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/26/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
08/26/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
08/26/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
09/08/2010 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that GET, LLC is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/22/2010PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to this Court's Order of 9/8/10 directing petitioner to identify counsel (Attorney Bar # needed)(Per phone call w/atty - he will not be representing Petitioner)
10/27/2010 On consideration of this court's September 8, 2010, order, directing petitioner to identify its counsel and petitioner's response identifying counsel, and it appearing that the counsel has informed the court that he will not enter his appearance in this matter, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15(A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (ETW)
11/29/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
11/29/2010DISMISSED
12/21/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived