Case: 05-92-02813-CV
05-92-02813-CV
11/13/1992
Contract
Eland Energy, Inc.
Ed McAnalley & Donald R. Harper
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/14/2004 | Order Entered | Destroy | |
02/06/2004 | Record Pickup | | |
03/30/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/30/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/31/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
01/04/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
12/20/1993 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
12/20/1993 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
11/09/1993 | Submission | | |
11/09/1993 | Submitted | | |
11/09/1993 | Submission | | |
11/09/1993 | Submitted | | |
10/28/1993 | Motion to Show Authorities | | |
10/12/1993 | MattConv | | |
08/13/1993 | Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/23/1993 | Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief | | |
07/23/1993 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
07/09/1993 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
06/09/1993 | Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/07/1993 | Response to Motion | | |
05/18/1993 | Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief | | |
05/10/1993 | Mot Ext Time File Strans Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/04/1993 | Brief Filed | | |
05/04/1993 | Brief Filed | | |
05/04/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/04/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/29/1993 | Mot Ext Time File Strans | | |
04/29/1993 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |
04/19/1993 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/08/1993 | Response to Motion | | |
04/01/1993 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/08/1993 | Brief Filed | | |
02/12/1993 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
02/11/1993 | Response to Motion | | |
02/08/1993 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
02/08/1993 | Mot Ext Time File Strans Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/08/1993 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/08/1993 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/02/1993 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |
01/29/1993 | Mot Ext Time File Strans | | |
01/29/1993 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
01/15/1993 | Letter Filed | | |
01/06/1993 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
01/05/1993 | MattConv | | |
01/04/1993 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
12/09/1992 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |
11/13/1992 | Transcript Filed | | |
11/13/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/15/1992 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
10/06/1992 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/17/2004 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
91-02824-A