Case: 03-93-00002-CV
03-93-00002-CV
01/06/1993
Divorce
Dareld Ray Morris, II
Neala Stacy Lyytinen
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/25/2003 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
01/23/1996 | CASE STORED | | |||
01/23/1996 | CASE STORED | | |||
01/24/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |||
11/10/1993 | Opinion issued |
| |||
09/29/1993 | Submitted | | |||
09/29/1993 | Submission | | |||
09/16/1993 | Mt to Withdraw as attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/10/1993 | Mt to Withdraw as attorney filed | | |||
08/24/1993 | Letter received | | |||
08/09/1993 | Submission | | |||
04/20/1993 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |||
04/16/1993 | Amended motion for extension on brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
04/16/1993 | Brief filed | | |||
04/16/1993 | Brief filed | | |||
04/16/1993 | Brief filed | | |||
04/16/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |||
04/16/1993 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Dismissed | | ||
04/05/1993 | Brief received, not filed | | |||
04/05/1993 | Brief received, not filed | | |||
04/02/1993 | Mot to Consolidate Cases Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
04/02/1993 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Overruled | | ||
04/02/1993 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Overruled | | ||
03/29/1993 | Amended motion for extension on brief filed | | |||
03/29/1993 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
03/26/1993 | Affidavit filed | | |||
03/05/1993 | Response to Motion | | |||
03/05/1993 | Response to Motion | | |||
03/04/1993 | Response to Motion | | |||
02/26/1993 | Mot to Consolidated Case Filed | | |||
02/26/1993 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
02/25/1993 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
02/25/1993 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
02/01/1993 | Transcript & SF Filed | | |||
01/20/1993 | Motion to file record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/12/1993 | Supplement to motion filed | | |||
01/06/1993 | Motion to File Record Filed | | |||
01/06/1993 | Statement of Facts Received | | |||
01/06/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/24/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Morris, Ii, Dareld Ray | Appellant | Mr. Dick Terrell Brown |
Lyytinen, Neala Stacy | Appellee | Mr. Art Keinarth |
Morris, Ii, Dareld Ray | Appellant | Mr. Dareld Ray Morris, Ii |
Trial Court Information
21st District Court
Bastrop
Honorable John L. Placke
16,115