Case: 10-16-00019-CV
10-16-00019-CV
01/21/2016
Contract
American Lumber, Inc.
Eagle Forest Products, LLC (Idaho), Eagle Forest Products, LLC (Texas), Brad Bower, Eddie Winn and Andrew Keys
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/04/2016 | Case stored | | |||
08/04/2016 | Mandate issued | | |||
08/04/2016 | Bill of costs |
| |||
06/02/2016 | Submitted | | |||
06/02/2016 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
06/02/2016 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Grant motion | | ||
06/02/2016 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||
06/02/2016 | Judgment Issued | | |||
05/26/2016 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||
05/11/2016 | Notice filed |
| |||
05/10/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file record filed |
| |||
05/06/2016 | Notice filed |
| |||
05/04/2016 | Motion disposed | | |||
04/28/2016 | Motion filed |
| |||
04/07/2016 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record | | |||
03/31/2016 | Clerks record filed | | |||
03/23/2016 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
03/17/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file record filed |
| |||
03/17/2016 | Response filed |
| |||
03/16/2016 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||
03/16/2016 | Notice of late record | First notice giving 30 days to file record | | ||
02/08/2016 | Docketing statement filed | ||||
01/28/2016 | Letter received |
| |||
01/28/2016 | Fee paid |
| |||
01/21/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||
12/04/2015 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||
11/05/2015 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/03/2022 | Case Stored | Send 6 year letter in cv cases |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
American Lumber, Inc. | Appellant | Matthew D. Doss S. Gary Werley |
Eagle Forest Products, LLC (Idaho) | Appellee | Zach Wolfe |
Keys, Andrew | Appellee | Zach Wolfe |
Eagle Forest Products, LLC (Texas) | Appellee | Zach Wolfe |
Bower, Brad | Appellee | Zach Wolfe |
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
Honorable Hon. Kyle Hawthorne
13-002584-CV-85
Paula K. Frederick