judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7549
A-7549
10/16/1959
Application for Writ of Error
WEATHERFORD OIL TOOL COMPANY, INCORPORATED
A. G. CAMPBELL, B. E. JORDAN AND LUKE MASSENGALE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/12/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
12/10/1959Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
10/16/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/1960Concurring and Dissenting Opinion delivered
12/07/1960Opinion issued
02/12/1960Response to Petition
12/16/1959Document received (See Remarks)
12/10/1959Supplement to Petition filedFiling granted
10/16/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/16/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A. G. Campbell, B. E. Jordan and Luke MassengaleRespondent
Weatherford Oil Tool Company, IncorporatedPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information