Case: 15-0966
15-0966
12/16/2015
Second Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
STEVEN GREGORY SLOAT, ED BRYAN, CHURCH OF SCIENTOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, DAVID J. LUBOW AND MONTY DRAKE
MONIQUE RATHBUN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/19/2016 | Petition for Review #2 | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Steven Gregory Sloat, Ed Bryan, David J. Lubow, and Monty Drake. |
| ||||
02/19/2016 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Church of Scientology International. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/26/2016 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
10/26/2016 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
09/16/2016 | Petition for Review disposed | Dismissed | |
| ||||
09/16/2016 | Petition for Review disposed | Dismissed | | | ||||
08/01/2016 | Status report filed | Status Report filed on behalf of petitioners, Church of Scientology Int'l, et al. | ||||||
07/18/2016 | Status Report requested | Status report request due no later than August 17, 2016. |
| |||||
05/06/2016 | Order of the Court Issued | Issued | The Court lifts the stay imposed by section 51.014(b) of the Texas Civil Practice and Remedies Code for the limited purpose of allowing Monique Rathbun to file and have heard a motion to dismiss the lawsuit in the 207th District Court. | |||||
05/06/2016 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Filing granted | Motion for Limited Lift of Stay granted. (5/6/2016 10:53:47 AM) 15-0966 ORDER ISSUED_05-06-16.pdf |
| ||||
05/02/2016 | Call received | Mr. Alexander, counsel for petitioner, called the Clerk to inform him that he will not be filing a response to the motion to lift stay. | | |||||
04/28/2016 | Call received | Mr. Alexander, counsel for petitioner, called the Clerk to discuss the status of the unooposed motion to lift stay. Mr. Alexander confirmed that the motion is unopposed, but he is contemplating filing something to clarify the procedural posture of the case. | | |||||
04/27/2016 | Miscellaneous Motion | Unopposed Motion for Limited Lift of Stay filed on behalf of Monique Rathbun. | ||||||
04/22/2016 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested responses to petitions for writ of mandamus due no later than May 23, 2016. |
| |||||
03/22/2016 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Called Ms. Bascom regarding the struck letter. | | |||||
03/22/2016 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
03/22/2016 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
03/17/2016 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Monique Rathbun. | ||||||
03/11/2016 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Called Ms. Bascom regarding struck letter. | | |||||
03/02/2016 | Letter Filed | Letter filed by attorney Stephanie Bascon on behalf of David Lubow regarding contact information and notice. | ||||||
02/25/2016 | Document received (See Remarks) | Copy of the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed in Comal County. On behalf of Monique Rathbun. | ||||||
02/19/2016 | Petition for Review #2 | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Steven Gregory Sloat, Ed Bryan, David J. Lubow, and Monty Drake. |
| |||||
02/19/2016 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Church of Scientology International. |
| |||||
02/12/2016 | Order of the Court Issued | Issued | The Court lifts the stay imposed by section 51.014(b) of the Texas Civil Practice and Remedies Code for limited purpose of allowing withdrawal of Monique Rathbun's counsel. | |||||
02/12/2016 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Filing granted | Motion for Limited Lift of Stay granted | | ||||
02/12/2016 | Motion to withdraw disposed of | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Withdraw of Counsel for Respondent granted (2/12/2016 9:48:45 AM) 15-0966 ORDER ISSUED.pdf |
| ||||
02/05/2016 | Supplement to Motion filed | Supplement to Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel for Respondent filed on behalf of Monique Rathbun. | ||||||
02/05/2016 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Call made to respondent attorney, Leslie Hyman, regarding Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel and Limited Lift of Stay. Left voicemail | | |||||
01/29/2016 | Miscellaneous Motion | Unopposed Motion for Limited Lift of Stay filed on behalf of Monique Rathbun. | ||||||
01/29/2016 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Message left for Ms. Hyman informing her that two separate motions must be filed. | | |||||
01/28/2016 | Miscellaneous Motion | Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel for Respondent filed on behalf of Monique Rathbun. | ||||||
01/19/2016 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Petition for Review is due February 19, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored |
| ||||
01/19/2016 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of the Church of Scientology. |
| |||||
12/17/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Petition for Review is due January 20, 2016. |
| ||||
12/16/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of the Church of Scientology International. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/26/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Church of Scientology International | Petitioner 1 | Mr. George H. Spencer Jr. Mr. Nicholas B. Bacarisse Mr. Thomas S. Leatherbury Mr. Douglas W. Alexander Mr. Isaac J. Huron Mr. L. J. Strieber Mr. Ricardo G. Cedillo Mr. Marc A. Fuller |
Bryan, Ed | Petitioner 2 | Mr. Jonathan H. Hull |
Lubow, David J. | Petitioner 2 | Ms. Stephanie S. Bascon |
Sloat, Stephen Gregory | Petitioner 2 | Mr. Jonathan H. Hull Ms. Ashley Bowen Murphy |
Drake, Monty | Petitioner 2 | Mr. O. Paul Dunagan Mr. Gary D. Sarles |
Rathburn, Monique | Respondent | Mr. Monique Rathburn |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-14-00199-CV
Aff/Pt and Rev/Pt
513 SW3d 500, 11-06-15
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable Scott K. Field
Trial Court Information
207th District Court
Comal
Honorable Dibrell W. Waldrip
C-2013-1082B