judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KAMIT INSTITUTE FOR MAGNIFICENT ACHIEVERS V. DCPS CHARTER BD

Case Information: 10-CV-1055
Short Caption:KAMIT INSTITUTE FOR MAGNIFICENT ACHIEVERS V. DCPS CHARTER BDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAP6091-10Filed Date:08/25/2010

Opening Event Date:08/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/24/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKamit Institute for Management Achievers (the)N
Charles B. MolsterNN
Adam E. Hess NN
William Y. Durbin NN
AppelleeDistrict of Columbia Public Schools Charter BoardN
Brian C. AndersonNN
Courtney A. DyerNN
IntervenorDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/25/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/25/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT WITH EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY
08/25/2010RECEIVED - Appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay Superior Court Decision Denying Motion to Stay Agency Action with Disclosure Statement pursuant to DCCA Rules 27(d)(5) and 28(a)(2)and the Administrative Record Volumes 1 thru 5 with Appendix and Exhibits (8 boxes)
08/25/2010TMC - appellant's motion for leave to file excess page motion - appellant's EMERGENCY motion to stay (LODGED) - appellant's disclosure statement - motion of venable LLC to withdraw
08/26/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS and entry of appearance by Winston & Strawn LLP on behalf of appellant. (Titled as: Notice of Withdrawal . . . ) Granted
08/26/2010RECEIVED - Intervenor's (D.C.) response to petitioner's motion for stay and emergency appeal of Superior Court decision denying motion to stay agency action (Titled: response of D.C. emergency motion for stay...)
08/27/2010APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION- to exceed page limit with its response in oppo to petitoner's emergency motion for stay and emergency appeal (no oppo) ( D.C. Public Charter School Board)
08/27/2010RECEIVED- aplt's reply to aple's response to aplt's emergency motion for stay and emergency appeal.
08/27/2010RECEIVED - D.C. Public Charter School Board's response in oppo to petitioner's emergency motion for stay emergency
08/27/2010 ORDERED that the MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE IN EXCESS OF THE PAGE LIMITATIONS ARE GRANTED and the Clerk SHALL FILE THE LODGED MOTION for stay, opposition and reply. It is *****MORE*****
08/27/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
08/27/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION
08/27/2010INTERVENOR'S ANSWER/RESPONSE
08/27/2010APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE
08/27/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION OF KENNETH SLAUGHTER, ESQ, DAMON WRIGHT, ESQ and SETH ROSENTHAL, ESQ TO WITHDRAW as counsel for appellant IS GRANTED and the appearance of each of these attorneys is HEREBY WITHDRAWN. It is ****MORE*****
08/27/2010 F/ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (BRTHFA) (rm)
08/31/2010RECORD INDEX
08/31/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (155-pgs/tape 8/17/10 proc.) (Transferred to 11-CV-710 on 8/10/11)
08/31/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (115-pgs/van bremen 8/23/10 proc.) w/cd attached (Transferred to 11-CV-710 on 8/10/11) w/o CD
09/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (two boxes containing agency record vol. 1-5)
09/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (exhibit to Kamit emergency motion pursuant to sup. ct.r. civ p. agency rev.1(b) for stay of PCSB Decision-1 box containing vol.1-4)
10/07/2010 On consideration of this court's order of August 27, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
10/26/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL interlocutory appeal of Superior Court Decision denying motion to stay agency action
11/03/2010 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion to dismiss this appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed and the parties will bear their own costs. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b). (ETW) elp
11/03/2010DISMISSED
11/24/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived