judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8698
A-8698
11/15/1961
Application for Writ of Error
NATALIE K. HALEPESKA, ET AL.
CALLIHAM INTERESTS, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/15/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/14/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/29/1963Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
10/17/1962Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/03/1962Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/03/1962Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/27/1962Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/29/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/02/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
11/15/1961Errata FiledPetitioner
11/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/10/1965Returned document(s). See Remarks.
09/27/1963Response to Motion filed
08/15/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/14/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/05/1963Motion to Argue filedOverruled
07/31/1963Dissenting opinion issued.
07/31/1963Opinion issued
07/29/1963Supplemental Brief filed
10/17/1962Response to Brief filed
10/03/1962Response to Brief filed
10/03/1962Supplemental Brief filed
02/27/1962Supplemental Brief filed
01/29/1962Reply to Response
01/02/1962Response to Petition
11/15/1961Errata Filed
11/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/15/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Calliham Interests, Inc.Respondent
Natalie K. Halepeska, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information