judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Carla Renee Rhodes v. The State of Texas

Case: 05-18-00072-CR
05-18-00072-CR
01/22/2018
Murder
Carla Renee Rhodes
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
08/21/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/31/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
11/16/2018Mandate issued
09/18/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant
09/06/2018Memorandum opinion issuedDismissed
09/06/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
09/05/2018Submitted
09/05/2018Motion to dismiss filed
08/31/2018State brief due
08/30/2018Set for submission on oral argument
08/21/2018Case ready to be set
08/21/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/17/2018Appellants brief due
08/06/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
08/01/2018Appearance of counsel
08/01/2018Motion to supplement record filed
07/31/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested
07/18/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
07/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/17/2018Appellants brief due
06/17/2018Appellants brief due
06/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/22/2018Exhibits filed
05/16/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
05/11/2018Letter filed
05/09/2018Reporters record due
04/24/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/23/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed
04/02/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed
04/02/2018Sealed clerk record filed
03/21/2018No clerks record filed in criminal case
03/21/2018No reporters record filed in criminal case
03/17/2018Record due
01/23/2018Docketing statement filed
01/23/2018Docketing statement filed
01/22/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
01/16/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court
01/16/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/06/2043RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
11/16/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rhodes, Carla ReneeCriminal - AppellantNanette Hendrickson  
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJessie R. Allen  
Lori Ordiway  
Faith Johnson  
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Gracie Lewis
F-1514137-J
Kimberly R. Xavier
15 years institutional division, TDCJ