judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-279
A-279
07/24/1944
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. FLORENCE SMITH, A WIDOW, ET AL.
R. C. LEVY, TEXAN, INC., AND R. C. LEVY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/21/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/19/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/04/1944Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/24/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/24/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
07/24/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/24/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/21/1944Motion for RehearingRefused
10/19/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/04/1944Order from Lower Court filed
08/04/1944Response to Petition
07/24/1944Brief in Support of Petition
07/24/1944Response to Petition
07/24/1944Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/24/1944Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/24/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texan, Inc., and R. C. LevyRespondent
R. C. LevyRespondent
Mrs. Florence Smith, a widow, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information