judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAUL VS. SPANISH SPRINGS

Case Information: 38174
Short Caption:PAUL VS. SPANISH SPRINGSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - 8611311Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/01/2001 / Manoukian, NoelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kenneth James McKenna, Inc.--check no. 4488.
07/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12083
08/01/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Noel Manoukian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/04/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14922
10/02/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-16542
10/03/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 2, 2001. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on September 28, 2001. 01-16617
10/03/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-16402
10/05/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Noel Manoukian.
11/20/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-19460
11/20/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-19461
11/28/2001Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 01-19886
12/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b) NNP/CLK 01-20813
12/12/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.