judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FSQ, INC., f/k/a FIVE STAR QUALITY CARE, INC., a foreign for profit corporation doing business under the trade name of WORLAND HEALTHCARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER v. DOROTHY ANN TAYLOR and THOMAS MICHAEL BUNDREN, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Thomas Beason Bundren

Case Heading (S-07-0192)
Case Number:S-07-0192Case Docketed On:08/17/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:FSQ, INC., f/k/a FIVE STAR QUALITY CARE, INC., a foreign for profit corporation doing business under the trade name of WORLAND HEALTHCARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER v. DOROTHY ANN TAYLOR and THOMAS MICHAEL BUNDREN, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Thomas Beason Bundren
Full Title:FSQ, INC., f/k/a FIVE STAR QUALITY CARE, INC., a foreign for profit corporation doing business under the trade name of WORLAND HEALTHCARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, Appellant (Defendant), v. DOROTHY ANN TAYLOR and THOMAS MICHAEL BUNDREN, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Thomas Beason Bundren, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFSQ, Inc.Gary R. Scott
AppellantFive Star Quality Care, Inc.
AppellantWorland Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center
AppelleeDorothy Ann TaylorLaurence W. Stinson
AppelleeThomas Michael BundrenLaurence W. Stinson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/20/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/20/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/22/2007Motion - Stay - other. Appellant's unopposed motion to stay appeal; and received proposed order.MotionStay - otherFinal
09/05/2007Order - Granting stayOrderGranting stayFinal
10/05/2007Event - Phone Call - Contacted counsel for appellant regarding status of proceedings in district. A hearing is scheduled for November 21, 2007.EventPhone CallFinal
12/18/2007Event - Phone Call. Spoke with Gary Scott. He stated the district court orally granted the motion to set aside default and judgment. He has submitted a proposed order. He will notify us when it is signed and will submit papers to dismiss appeal.EventPhone CallFinal
01/15/2008Event - Phone Call. Spoke with Gary Scott. He has received order setting aside default judgment. He will be submitting a motion and proposed order to dismiss appeal.EventPhone CallFinal
01/17/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
01/17/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/17/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal