judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN HILL STURDIVANT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1064
Short Caption:JOHN HILL STURDIVANT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD4899-10Filed Date:08/24/2010

Opening Event Date:08/24/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/08/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/10/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Hill Sturdivant Y
John A. Briley, Jr.NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/25/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) John Briley, Jr., Esquire
09/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that John Briley, Jr., Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to August 25, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. FOR THE COURT, JULIO A. CASTILLO, CLERK (By: JAC)
10/04/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt orderd/needed)dfe
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (65pgs/Tape) 5/25/10 proc.
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (7pgs/Tape) 6/30/10 proc. w/CD included
10/08/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/25/2010RECORD INDEX
10/25/2010RECORD COPIES
11/22/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 60 days (no oppo).
12/07/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 24, 2010. (By: JAC)
01/10/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND (No Oppo).
01/19/2011ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT MOTION TO REMAND and the case is remanded to the Superior Court for further proceedings consistent with the statements made in appellant's motion. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (By: ETW)
01/19/2011REMANDED
02/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED