Case: WR-87,952-01
WR-87,952-01
01/12/2018
11.07 HC
SUMMERLIN, JEFFREY ALLEN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/06/2018 | ACTION TAKEN | DISMISSED; SENTENCE DISCHARGED |
| ||||
05/21/2018 | SUPP RECD |
| |||||
04/05/2018 | ADDRESS CHANGE | | |||||
02/28/2018 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
01/12/2018 | WRIT RECEIVED |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/06/2018 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SUMMERLIN, JEFFREY ALLEN | Applicant | Georgina Stephenson |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
25th District Court
Guadalupe
07-0428-CR-A