judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8689
A-8689
11/03/1961
Application for Writ of Error
J. J. MILLER
B. A. TESTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/18/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/29/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/20/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
11/03/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/23/1962Response to Motion filed
01/18/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/29/1961Reply to Response
11/20/1961Response to Petition
11/03/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/03/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
B. A. TestonRespondent
J. J. MillerPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information