judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38173
Short Caption:SMITH (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C74915Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice LeavittPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/03/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
07/16/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12080
08/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38096/38173/38180/38202/38203. 01-13673
12/03/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 4. 01-20145
12/03/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/17/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-WM/CY/DA 02-06900
05/14/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-06973
05/14/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 16, 2002. 02-06973