judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALVAH R. DANIEL, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0191)
Case Number:S-07-0191Case Docketed On:08/17/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ALVAH R. DANIEL, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ALVAH R. DANIEL, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAlvah R. DanielDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 87
Citation:189 P.3d 859

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/17/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/02/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/03/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/19/2007Brief - Appellant; recieved copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
12/21/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy on disk and designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/15/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant; Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/03/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/03/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/29/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/14/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/14/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/18/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/15/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal