judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARYANNE TAGOE V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 10-AA-1063
Short Caption:MARYANNE TAGOE V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB007-10Filed Date:08/26/2010

Opening Event Date:08/26/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/25/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMaryanne Tagoe YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/26/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW -NUNT PRO TUNC LW
08/26/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
09/02/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged PFR, NPT to AUGUST 26, 2010. It is *****MORE*****
09/02/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this petition should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER which remanded the case. See Washington Hospital Center v. DC Dept. of Employmnt Serv., 712 A.2d 1018 (DC 1998).(BY: ETW)
09/02/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
09/13/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to 9/2/10 order
09/30/2010 ORDERED that the PWM IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER... (KRNBST) (rl)
09/30/2010DISMISSED
10/25/2010MANDATE ISSUED
11/08/2011FiledMotion To Reinstate Appeal (Petitioner)Denied
11/09/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO REINSTATE
11/22/2011FiledORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE and REQUEST TO TREAT THE MOTION AS A NEW PETITION FOR REVIEW...
11/28/2011FiledMotion To Reconsider of 11/22/11 (Petitioner)Denied
11/29/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO RECONSIDER
11/30/2011FiledMotion To Consolidate (Petitioner)Denied as Moot
12/05/2011FiledORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTIONS TO RECONSIDER AND TO CONSOLIDATE
04/17/2014FiledArchived