Case: 02-19-00289-CR
02-19-00289-CR
07/29/2019
Murder
Taymor Travon McIntyre
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/29/2020 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||
05/29/2020 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
03/04/2021 | Motion for en banc reconsideration disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||||
02/12/2021 | Motion for en banc reconsideration filed |
| |||||||
02/11/2021 | Motion to publish opinion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
02/05/2021 | Motion to publish opinion filed |
| |||||||
01/28/2021 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
10/06/2020 | Exhibits filed |
| |||||||
09/29/2020 | Submitted | | |||||||
09/28/2020 | Order entered |
| |||||||
08/24/2020 | Letter received |
| |||||||
08/13/2020 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||||
07/30/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
07/29/2020 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
06/29/2020 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
06/29/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
06/29/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
05/29/2020 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
05/22/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
05/21/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
04/21/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
04/21/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
03/20/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
03/19/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
01/21/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
01/21/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
12/20/2019 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
11/26/2019 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed |
| |||||||
11/25/2019 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
11/25/2019 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
08/22/2019 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
08/12/2019 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
07/29/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/10/2021 | Status | Petition for discretionary review due in Court of Criminal Appeals |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
McIntyre, Taymor Travon | Criminal - Appellant | Jeff Kearney Samuel Parham Wm. Reagan Wynn |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Joseph W. Spence Andrea Jacobs |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Tarrant
Honorable Wayne Francis Salvant
1511547D
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 2
Ct. 1 55 Yrs. $10,000 Fine, Ct. 2 30 Yrs. $5000 Fine Cts. 3&4 13 Yrs. $3,000 Fine