judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4996
B-4996
01/02/1975
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. ART SCHRADER
LUIS F. GARCIA, SARITA GARCIA AND ELOISA GARCIA, VIRGINIA H. TATTON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF J. MEREDITH TATTON, DECEASED, DBA SALT CREEK RANCH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/11/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/23/1975Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
01/17/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
01/15/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
01/02/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/14/1975Response to Motion filed
04/11/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/23/1975Supplement to Petition filed
01/17/1975Response to Petition
01/15/1975Response to Petition
01/02/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/02/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Art SchraderPetitioner
Virginia H. Tatton, individually and as Independent Executor of the Estate of J. Meredith Tatton, deceased, dba Salt Creek RanchRespondent
Luis F. Garcia, Sarita Garcia and Eloisa GarciaRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information