judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4975
B-4975
12/13/1974
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
CITY OF GALVESTON, TEXAS
JOHN L. HILL, ATTORNEY GENERAL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/27/1975Supplemental Brief filedAmicus Curiae
01/22/1975Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/20/1975Response to Brief filedRespondent
01/15/1975Post submission brief filedRelator
01/10/1975Amended Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent
01/09/1975Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/08/1975Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/06/1975Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/31/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
12/13/1974Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/13/1974Brief on the Merits
12/13/1974Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/19/1975Opinion issued
01/27/1975Supplemental Brief filed
01/22/1975Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/20/1975Response to Brief filed
01/15/1975Post submission brief filed
01/10/1975Amended Response to Petition for Review filed
01/09/1975Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/08/1975Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/06/1975Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/02/1975Motion for leave to file brief
12/31/1974Response to Petition
12/23/1974Motion for leave to file brief
12/23/1974Motion for leave to file brief
12/13/1974Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/13/1974Brief on the Merits
12/13/1974Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
12/13/1974Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McCall, Parkhurst and HortonAmicus Curiae
Fulbright and JaworskiAmicus Curiae
Nueces County Navigation District No.1Amicus Curiae
Port of Bay City Authority of Matagorda County, TexasAmicus Curiae
Aransas County Navigation District No.1Amicus Curiae
John L. Hill, Attorney GeneralRespondent
CITY OF GALVESTON, TEXASRelator
Chambers-Liberty Counties Navigation DistrictAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information