Case: 13-16-00601-CV
13-16-00601-CV
11/03/2016
Suit affecting parent child relationship
Yvonne Sanchez
Eric Scott Boone and Jobeth Castro
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2017 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
12/21/2016 | Submitted | | |||||||
12/21/2016 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
11/28/2016 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||||||
11/28/2016 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||||||
11/28/2016 | Submit on clerk's record alone - briefs due |
| |||||||
11/28/2016 | Document returned | | |||||||
11/21/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
11/08/2016 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record |
| |||||||
11/08/2016 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
11/07/2016 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||||
11/03/2016 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
11/03/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
09/06/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
08/20/2016 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/07/2017 | Case Stored | Case stored |
03/07/2023 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Castro, JoBeth | Appellee | Ms. JoBeth Castro |
Sanchez, Yvonne | Appellant | Ms. Yvonne Sanchez |
Boone, Eric Scott | Appellee | Hon. Jane Lane |
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
Calhoun
Honorable Jack W. Marr
08-02-0416
Marnie Gabrysch