Case: 03-18-00160-CV
03-18-00160-CV
03/14/2018
Mandamus
In re Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Dana Guess and Scott Sheffield
Yes
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/07/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Relator | | ||||
03/14/2018 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/18/2018 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
07/17/2018 | Submitted | | |||||
05/07/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
04/16/2018 | Response disposed | | |||||
03/30/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file response disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
03/27/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file response filed | | |||||
03/22/2018 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
03/21/2018 | Order entered | Ordered |
| ||||
03/21/2018 | Motion to expedite disposed | Dismissed as Moot | | ||||
03/21/2018 | Motion for temporary relief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/20/2018 | Motion to expedite filed |
| |||||
03/19/2018 | Notice filed | | |||||
03/14/2018 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
03/14/2018 | Letter filed |
| |||||
03/14/2018 | Motion for temporary relief filed |
| |||||
03/14/2018 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/18/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sheffield, Scott | Relator | Mr. Scot G. Doyen Mr. Alasdair Roberts |
Richards, Jeffrey | Real party in interest | Mr. Robert E. Valdez Mr. Joseph Cuellar |
Lougheed, Courtney | Real party in interest | Mr. Henry L. Moore Mr. D. Todd Smith |
Guess, Dana | Relator | Mr. Scot G. Doyen Mr. Alasdair Roberts |
Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company | Relator | Mr. Alasdair Roberts Mr. Scot G. Doyen |
Trial Court Information
261st District Court
Travis
Honorable Lora J. Livingston
D-1-GN-17-000837