judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

METHODIST RICHARDSON MEDICAL CENTER AND METHODIST HEALTH SYSTEM FOUNDATION v. DEBBIE WHEELER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF LARRY J. WHEELER, KIM ADAMS, AND KRISTIE STEWART

Case: 18-0043
18-0043
01/19/2018
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
METHODIST RICHARDSON MEDICAL CENTER AND METHODIST HEALTH SYSTEM FOUNDATION
DEBBIE WHEELER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF LARRY J. WHEELER, KIM ADAMS, AND KRISTIE STEWART
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
01/19/2018Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Methodist Richardson Medical Center, et al.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
04/05/2018Notice sent to Court of Appeals
02/23/2018Petition for Review disposedDenied
01/23/2018Case forwarded to Court
01/22/2018Response Waiver filedResponse Waiver filed on behalf of Debbie Wheeler, et al.
01/19/2018Petition for ReviewPetition for Review filed on behalf of Methodist Richardson Medical Center, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/05/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Debbie Wheeler, Individually and as the Representative of the Estate of Larry WheelerRespondentMr. John A. Davis Jr.
Mr. Steven Ray Davis
Mr. Iain Gordon Simpson
Gutierrez, M.D., Jose A.Other interested party Ms. Julie A. Mederos
Adams, KimRespondentMr. Steven Ray Davis
Mr. John A. Davis Jr.
Mr. Iain Gordon Simpson
Methodist Richardson Medical Center, et al.PetitionerMr. Brandon Scott Kulwicki
Stewart, KristieRespondentMr. John A. Davis Jr.
Mr. Steven Ray Davis
Mr. Iain Gordon Simpson
Court of Appeals Information:
05-17-00332-CV
Reverse & Remand
___ SW3d ___, 12-07-17
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Elizabeth Lang-Miers
Trial Court Information
416th District Court
Collin
Honorable Andrea Stroh Thompson
416-01327-2016