judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LINDA HENDRICKS, Individually and As Personal Representative for Ryan Hendricks, a Minor and as Best Friend For Her Children v. JOHN HURLEY AND MAUREEN HURLEY

Case Heading (S-07-0178)
Case Number:S-07-0178Case Docketed On:08/08/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:LINDA HENDRICKS, Individually and As Personal Representative for Ryan Hendricks, a Minor and as Best Friend For Her Children v. JOHN HURLEY AND MAUREEN HURLEY
Full Title:LINDA HENDRICKS, Individually and As Personal Representative for Ryan Hendricks, a Minor and as Best Friend For Her Children, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JOHN HURLEY AND MAUREEN HURLEY, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLinda HendricksBruce S. Asay
AppelleeJohn HurleyRaymond W. Martin
AppelleeMaureen HurleyRaymond W. Martin

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Negligence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 57
Citation:184 P.3d 680 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/08/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/08/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/24/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/25/2007Record - Supplemental record on appealRecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
10/19/2007Brief - Appellees, John & Maureen Hurley; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
11/09/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellees - unopposed joint motion for extension of time for appellee Stewart Drilling company, Inc. and the State of Wyoming to file response briefs.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/13/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/13/2007Event - Phone Call - contacted Mr. Asay and advised that the reply brief would be due within 15 days (since that's calculated from due date of last appellee brief, although they will not be filing a brief).EventPhone CallFinal
11/28/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/27/2007Motion - Dismiss - stipulated. Stipulated motion to dismiss appeal with prejudice as to Stewart Drilling Company, Inc. and the State of Wyoming.MotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
12/27/2007Order - Dismissing party. Order granting stipulated motion to dismiss appeal with prejudice as to Stewart Drilling Company, Inc. and the State of Wyoming.OrderDismissing partyFinal
12/27/2007Event - Phone Call. Called Bruce Asay. Informed him that we were amending the caption and asked if he will be filing an amended designation of record with the District Court. Request the record after we receive our copy of the amended designation.EventPhone CallFinal
01/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (appellant's amended)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/15/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four total volumes. District Court No. 168-328; one volume, original papers. District Court No. 166-234; three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers, volume III, depositions.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bruce Asay for appellant; Ray Martin for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/25/2008Brief - Other - received copy of appellants' opening and reply briefs on diskBriefOtherFinal
03/03/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Bruce S. Asay for appellant; Raymond W. Martin for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/03/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/22/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/09/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/09/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/11/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal