Case Information: 10-CV-1045 | |||
Short Caption: | VIVIAN WEEKS V. EVERETT MURTAGH | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LTB4030-10 | Filed Date: | 08/12/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/12/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 12/23/2010 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | |||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Vivian Weeks | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | Everett Murtagh | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/12/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
09/20/2010 | On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 12, 2010 , it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp | |||
10/14/2010 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS | |||
10/21/2010 | APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion to proceed IFP for the transcripts without cost to aplt | |||
10/28/2010 | On consideration of appellant's motion and financial information statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, the opposition thereto, and it appearing that transcript is required for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is granted. However, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order appellant must file a motion with the Court Reporting Divsion for preparation of transcripts or proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accorande with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motions to the appropriate Judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no costs. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of the motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to response to this order shall result in dismissal of this appeal without further notice of lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (ETW) elp | |||
11/08/2010 | RECEIVED: Copy of trial court's order granting transcripts without cost for the following dates: 5/26, 6/7, 7/1, 7/2, 7/6 and 7/13, 2010. | |||
11/09/2010 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) *(THIS IS A COST WAIVED CASE SO SRT IS MAT) (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 7/13/10, 7/6/10, 7/2/10, 7/1/10, 6/7/10 & 5/16/10) (elp) | |||
11/29/2010 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) *THIS IS A COST-WAIVED CASE SO SRT SHOULD BE MAT (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 7/13/10, 7/6/10, 7/2/10, 7/1/10, 6/28/10, 6/7/10, 5/26/10, 5/10/10, 4/7/10 & 3/10/10) (elp) | |||
12/15/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (56-pgs/tape 5/26/10 proc.) | |||
12/15/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (240-pgs/tape 6/7/10 proc.) | |||
12/15/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (162-pgs/tape 7/1/10 proc) | |||
12/15/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (192-pgs/tape 7/2/10 proc.) | |||
12/15/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (195-pgs/tape 7/6/10 proc.) | |||
12/15/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#6 (36-pgs/tape 7/13/10 proc.)w/cd | |||
12/23/2010 | RECORD INDEX | |||
12/23/2010 | RECORD COPIES | |||
12/23/2010 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
01/04/2011 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp | |||
02/17/2011 | On consideration of this court's order of January 4, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp | |||
02/18/2011 | RECEIVED - motion for ext of time to file brief. (returned for 1 more copy (orig & 2) & rule 27) | |||
03/11/2011 | On consideration of this court's order of February 17, 2011, directing appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp | |||
03/11/2011 | DISMISSED | |||
03/22/2011 | RECEIVED - praecipe to re-open case returned for motion and cert of service. |