judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4997
B-4997
01/02/1975
Application for Writ of Error
STAR MOTOR CARS
JERRY MUDD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/28/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/26/1975Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/05/1975Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/17/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
01/02/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/28/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/26/1975Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/05/1975Reply to Response
01/17/1975Response to Petition
01/02/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/02/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Automobile Dealers AssociationAmicus Curiae
STAR MOTOR CARSPetitioner
Jerry MuddRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information