judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4984
B-4984
12/30/1974
Application for Writ of Error
CREDIT BUREAU OF LAREDO, INC.
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/08/1975Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
05/07/1975Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/31/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
12/30/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
12/30/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/05/1975Opinion issued
05/08/1975Brief on the Merits
05/07/1975Brief on the Merits
04/15/1975Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
04/09/1975Document received (See Remarks)
04/09/1975Document received (See Remarks)
04/09/1975Document received (See Remarks)
04/09/1975Document received (See Remarks)
01/31/1975Response to Petition
12/30/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/30/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/30/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Credit Bureau of Laredo, Inc.Petitioner
State of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information