judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF KATZIN

Case Information: 38155
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF KATZINCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40301
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G20413Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/18/2001 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/11/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
07/11/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lionel Sawyer & Collins--check no. 086259.
07/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11746
07/18/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/26/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12658
07/30/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Persi J. Mishel.
08/14/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-13786
08/27/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation for Extension of Time to File the Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-14468
08/30/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. filed August 27, 2001. Appellant shall have to and including August 31, 2001, to file and serve the opposition. 01-14695
09/04/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. 01-14888
09/19/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: not known at this time. 01-15829
09/24/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Respondents' Request for Permission to File Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss. 01-16071
01/28/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 12, 2002. 02-01852
03/15/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-04745
03/26/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. fn1[We defer ruling on respondents' August 14, 2001 and September 24, 2001 motions, pending completion of our jurisdictional review.] Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-05313
04/18/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 28, 2000 and may 30, 2001. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 02-06936
07/22/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 14, 1999; January 19, 2000; and April 25, 2001. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 02-12567
07/26/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 16, 2002. 02-12888
08/19/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request) 02-14159
08/20/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant respondent's motion to file a reply, and direct the clerk of this court to file the reply provisionally received on September 24, 2001. We suspend briefing in this appeal pending our resolution of the motion to dismiss. 02-14200
08/20/2002MotionFiled Reply to Response. Respondents' Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss. 01-16072
08/22/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. filed August 19, 2002. Pursuant to order of this court entered on August 20, 2002, briefing has been suspended in this appeal. The motion is denied as moot. 02-14406
08/26/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 14, 1999; January 19, 2000; and April 25, 2001. Court Reporter: Shelly A. Ajoub. 02-14648
08/28/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request) 02-14894
09/06/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On August 28, 2002, appellant filed a motion for a third extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix. fn1[In support of the motion appellant indicates that he is still awaiting a transcript for proceedings conducted on February 9, 2001. The transcript request forms filed by appellant did not request the production of a transcript for that date.] On August 20, 2002, this court entered an order suspending the briefing of this appeal. We deny the motion as moot. 02-15360
08/27/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Respondents have moved to dismiss the appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Accordingly, as we lack jurisdiction, we grant respondents' motion and " . . . dismiss this appeal." fn3[We note that appellant has filed an original writ petition challenging the district court's order (Docket No. 40301), which is currently pending.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-14405
09/23/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-14469
09/23/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/02/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 25, 2003. 03-14469