judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAWN BYRNE V. ARCHSTONE SMITH COMMUNITIES, LLC

Case Information: 10-CV-1046
Short Caption:DAWN BYRNE V. ARCHSTONE SMITH COMMUNITIES, LLCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB38676-07Filed Date:08/13/2010

Opening Event Date:08/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/11/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDawn Byrne N
Bernard A. Gray, Sr.YY
AppelleeArchstone Smith Communities LLc.N
Todd KeltingNN
Sebastian Forgues NN
Richard D. Mirsky NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY- the trial court's order pending appeal and waive of bond
09/09/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 7/14/09 & 7/17/09) (elp)
09/09/2010TMC - appellant's motion to stay - appellee's motion to file (LODGED) oppo
09/22/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION
09/22/2010RECEIVED - aple's oppo to motion to stay the trial Court's order pending appeal and waiver of bond.
09/23/2010 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall FILE THE LODGED OPPOSITION. It is *****MORE*****
09/23/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION
09/23/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY TRIAL COURT ORDER and WAIVE OF BOND IS DENIED. See Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987). (FITHNB) (rm)
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (39-pgs/tape 7/14/10 proc.)
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (4-pgs/tape 7/17/10 proc.)w/cd attached
10/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/18/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 7, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
11/30/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appendix to 12/30/10 (opp) (elp)
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before December 30, 2010. (JAC) elp
12/30/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/30/2010APPENDIX
02/07/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant and the appendix were filed with this court on December 30, 2010, and it further appearing that the brief of appellee was due to be filed on or before February 3, 2011, (See D.C. App. R. 31) ,but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC) elp
02/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
02/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion to dismiss this appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed and each party to bear its owns fees and costs. See D.C. App. R. 13. (b).(ETW) elp
02/17/2011DISMISSED
03/11/2011MANDATE ISSUED