judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

YOUNG (ANDREW) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47936
Short Caption:YOUNG (ANDREW) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 52505
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C213930Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-17871
08/28/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 8/9/05, 8/23/05, 10/4/05, 2/1/06, 2/2/06, 3/16/06, 3/23/06, 3/30/06, 5/11/06, 6/8/06 and 7/27/06. Court Reporters: Angela Lee, Cheryl Gardner, JoAnn Scott, Paula Walsh, Thelma Stapley and Debbie Van Blaricom. Filed in district court on: August 24, 2006. 06-17872
09/14/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 3/23/06; 3/30/06; 5/11/06; 6/8/06; and 7/27/06. Court Reporter: Thelma Stapley. 06-18970
09/15/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: February 1 and February 2, 2006. Court Reporter: Cheryl Gardner. 06-19081
10/02/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-20144
10/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 2, 2006. Court reporters or recorders Angela Lee and Jo Scott shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days. Fast track statement and appendix due: 20 days from the filing of the transcripts. 06-20617
10/23/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 08/09/05. Court Reporter: Angela Lee. 06-21810
11/29/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporter or recorder Jo Ann Scott shall have 10 days to file the transcripts conducted on October 4, 2005, and March 16, 2006, or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. Appellant's counsel Nancy L. Lemcke requested the transcript conducted on August 23, 2005, from court reporter Angela Lee. Lemcke shall have 5 days to ascertain the correct court reporter or recorder and file and serve a corrected rough draft transcript request form or if Lemcke determines that Lee was the court reporter on that date, she shall have 5 days to file a notice so informing this court. 06-24370
11/30/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/16/06. Court Reporter: Jo A. Scott. 06-24540
12/04/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 8/9/05; 8/23/05; 10/4/05; 2/1/06; 2/2/06; 3/16/06; 3/23/06; 3/30/06; 5/11/06; 6/8/06; and 7/27/06. To Court Reporters: Lee; Gardner; Scott; Walsh; Stapley; and Blaricom. 06-24781
12/06/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/23/05, 2/1/06 and 2/2/06. Court Reporter: Cheryl Gardner. 06-24936
12/15/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 4, 2006. Court Reporter: Jo A. Scott. 06-25667
01/03/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-00141
01/18/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed 1/3/07. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 20 days. 07-01373
02/06/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/24/06. Court Reporter: Jo Anne Scott. 07-02925
02/12/2007MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant Young's Motion for Leave to File 20-Page Fast Track Statement. 07-03402
02/22/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/1/05, 12/8/05. Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. 07-04285
02/26/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on February 12, 2007. 07-04470
02/26/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 07-03403
02/26/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 07-03404
03/13/2007MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 07-05864
03/28/2007TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 1/5/05 and 12/8/05. Court Reporter: Gina M. Shrader. 07-07051
03/30/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed 3/13/07. The clerk shall file the fast track response received on March 13, 2007. 07-07264
03/30/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 07-05865
06/27/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-14020
07/06/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/01/05 and 12/08/05. Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. 07-14759
07/24/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-14222
07/24/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/03/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 30, 2007. 07-14222
10/10/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed September 25, 2007 and placed on the docket as Case No. 07-6808. 07-22402
11/14/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. 07-24824