judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DALLENBACH VS. CLARK COUNTY

Case Information: 46007
Short Caption:DALLENBACH VS. CLARK COUNTYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A419204Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/04/2005 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/27/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kirk T. Kennedy--check no. 7342.
09/27/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19146
09/30/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Justice Disqualification. It has been determined that Justice Douglas should no longer be disqualified.
10/04/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/14/2005Other Returned Mail. Notice of Assignment to Settlement addressed to Kirk Kennedy returned in a damaged envelope and remailed .
10/20/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
10/26/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-21229
11/21/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 16, 2005. 05-22906
01/03/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 16, 2005. 06-00102
01/13/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-00977
01/23/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 06-01571
02/21/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.
03/01/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 06-04636
04/27/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 24, 2006. 06-08940
05/31/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-11417
05/31/2006BriefReceived Opening Brief. 06-11418
06/06/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on May 31, 2006. Answering brief due: 30 days. 06-11750
06/06/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-11418
06/06/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 06-11419
06/30/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-13558
06/30/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 06-13559
08/08/2006Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
09/14/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn1[We have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07-MG/JH/RP 06-18974
10/10/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-20654
10/10/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/17/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 12, 2006. 06-20654