judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WEST (MERRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47938
Short Caption:WEST (MERRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 55555 , 56200 , 60669 , 62280
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C213145Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/21/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17874
09/11/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 06-18728
09/11/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-18729
09/15/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 16, 2006. Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. 06-19078
09/20/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/18/05, 06/22/06, 06/27/06, 06/29/06, and 08/16/06. To Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna, Renee Silvaggio, and Renee Vincent. 06-19376
09/20/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-19377
10/11/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 06/27/06 and 06/29/06. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 06-20816
10/31/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 07/18/05, 06/22/06. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-22270
12/22/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 29, 2006. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 06-26276
01/05/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 2/8/07. 07-00348
02/08/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/29/06. To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 07-03178
02/12/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 45 days. 07-03488
02/28/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: March 26, 2007. No further extensions of time shall be permitted abxsent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-04787
03/08/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 29, 2006. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 07-05499
03/28/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-06994
04/04/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-07572
04/06/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 2 days. 07-07735
04/09/2007MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 49-Page Opening Brief. 07-07874
04/10/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the 49-page opening brief and appendix received on April 9, 2007. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. 07-07967
04/10/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-07875
04/10/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. 07-07876
04/13/2007MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion Requesting Transmittal of an Exhibit Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). 07-08313
05/14/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-10642
06/11/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to transmit the original exhibit to this court. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the videotape marked as Proposed Exhibit 3, within 20 days of the date of this order, for filing and consideration with the appendix. 07-12644
06/14/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 11, 2007. 07-13052
07/13/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-15258
07/18/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed on July 13, 2007. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on July 11, 2007. 07-15612
07/18/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-15519
08/21/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 07-18470
08/21/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/06/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP-WM/MC/NS 08-14408
06/26/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. 08-16291
06/26/2008Post-Judgment PetitionReceived Petition for Rehearing. (Appellant). (FILED PER ORDER 07/07/08). 08-16293
07/07/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the petition for rehearing received on June 26, 2008. 08-17142
07/07/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (Appellant). 08-16293
09/25/2008Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). 08-24856
10/06/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 08-25713
10/21/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: 3 (CD) this day. 08-25172
10/21/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/En Banc Reconsideration Pending.
11/04/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 24, 2008. 08-25172
11/17/2008Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. 08-29285