judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TICICH VS. PACIFIC COAST BLDG. PRODUCTS

Case Information: 47937
Short Caption:TICICH VS. PACIFIC COAST BLDG. PRODUCTSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A489881Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2006 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/12/2008How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Daniels, Fine, Israel, Schonbuch & Lebovits, LLC--check no. 45201.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17876
09/01/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/12/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-18781
09/19/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-19287
09/28/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-19912
11/20/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-23772
11/30/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellants: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 06-24500
12/19/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/03/06 - 05/11/06. To Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. 06-25888
01/18/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/3/06 and 5/4/06. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 07-01308
02/21/2007MotionFiled Stipulation. 07-04189
02/26/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/08/06, 05/09/06, 05/10/06, and 05/11/06. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. 07-04618
03/15/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. Opening brief and appendix due: March 30, 2007. 07-06113
03/27/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-06860
03/29/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Enlargement of Time to file Appellant's Opening Brief, Affidavit of Moses Lebovits, Esq. 07-07075
04/11/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. and Regarding Transcripts. We note that all requested transcripts have been filed in this court. fn1[Our review of the district court minutes indicates that no proceedings were conducted on May 5-7, 2006.] Opening brief and appendix due: April 30, 2007. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. If Ms. Cook has not received the deposit for the transcripts requested of her, she shall notify this court, in writing, within 5 days or if she has received the deposit, she shall provide all of the requested transcripts to appellants immediately. 07-08102
04/27/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/4/06. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 07-09473
05/02/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-09830
05/02/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 07-09831
05/09/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. (Opening Brief). 07-10331
05/15/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 5, 2007. 07-10808
07/05/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-14651
08/06/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-17213
02/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Souhtern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 08-03418
02/12/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/06/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-11199
06/03/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-12033
06/03/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/11/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 5, 2008. 08-12033