judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE (DONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46022
Short Caption:WHITE (DONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C206837Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-19335
09/29/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 1/24/05, 7/6/05, 7/7/05 and 8/29/05. Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. Filed in district court on: September 26, 2005. 05-19336
10/25/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 01/24/05; 07/06/05; 07/07/05; and 08/29/05. Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. 05-21138
11/10/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-22225
11/29/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for extension of time filed November 10, 2005. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days. 05-23406
12/19/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-24638
12/19/2005Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 05-24639
12/19/2005AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Fast Track Appendix. 05-24640
01/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on December 19, 2005, and the fast track response received on January 6, 2006. 06-00943
01/13/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-24639
01/13/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-24640
01/13/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-00352
03/13/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-05313
04/07/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-05451
04/07/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/17/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 10, 2006. 06-05451