judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALLEN (GENE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46035
Short Caption:ALLEN (GENE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41274 , 42969 , 43599 , 44180 , 44597 , 44991 , 45220 , 45368 , 45447 , 45643 , 46666 , 47311 , 47501 , 48289 , 49167 , 49612 , 50188 , 50477 , 50809 , 51219 , 51353 , 51675 , 51940 , 52984 , 53246 , 53428 , 53429 , 53732 , 53911 , 54132 , 54302 , 55013 , 55574 , 55677 , 55828 , 56586 , 57925 , 57990 , 58038 , 58426 , 58427 , 58807 , 59173 , 60890 , 61311 , 72586 , 72586-COA , 72853 , 72864 , 72929 , 72964 , 73526 , 77046
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C177427Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-19408
11/07/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[We have received all proper person documents and conclude that no relief is warranted.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 05-21880
12/02/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-22438
12/02/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/08/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2005. 05-22438