judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLARK (CAMILLE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46023
Short Caption:CLARK (CAMILLE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48674 , 50946 , 58839
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C208473Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-19338
09/29/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/31/05, 6/1/05, 6/2/05 and 8/9/05. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio and JoAnn Orduna. Filed in district court on: September 26, 2005. 05-19339
11/09/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/31/05, 06/01/05, and 06/02/05. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 05-22129
11/10/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-22229
11/29/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Rough draft transcript due: 10 days. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcript to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 05-23404
12/19/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-24613
12/19/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-24614
12/19/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-24615
12/21/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. as Moot. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix having been timely filed, appellant's motion for an extension of time is denied as moot. 05-24887
01/11/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-00819
02/07/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 9, 2005. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-02705
05/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn4[The clerk of this court shall return to Clark unfiled all proper person documents he has submitted to this court in this matter.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-11010
05/24/2006Other Returned Unfiled Document. Motion for Leave to file Proper Person Pleadings and Motion for the Nevada Supreme Court to Intervene and Stay Direct Appeal Proceedings received on March 13, 2006, to appellant Camille Clark.
06/20/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-11849
06/20/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/29/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 26, 2006. 06-11849