judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STRAHAN VS. WASHOE CO.

Case Information: 46024
Short Caption:STRAHAN VS. WASHOE CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0501040Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/07/2005 / King, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of Jeffrey A. Dickerson--check no. 8772.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19340
10/07/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge:Patrick O. King . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/21/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
11/02/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to provide a completed proof of service including settlement judge. 05-21643
11/22/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 05-23002
11/23/2005Notice/Outgoing Letter. Patrick O. King (Amended Notice of Appeal).
02/14/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (With attached letter recommending sanctions) 06-03263
03/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. 06-06152
04/03/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-06948
04/06/2006MotionFiled Reply to Response. Washoe Co.'s Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-07322
04/21/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06-RR/MD/RP 06-08480
04/24/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Jeffrey A. Dickerson, counsel for appellant, shall show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against him personally within 10 days from the date of this order. We decline to impose sanctions against appellant as this court prefers not to impute to a client the neglect of his or her counsel. This court dismissed this appeal on April 21, 2006. The dismissal does not alleviate Mr. Dickerson's responsibility to respond to this order. We stay issuance of the remittitur pending further order of this court upon resolution of this matter. 06-08611
05/11/2006Other Other. Filed Showing of Cause; Request for Permission to File Late Showing of Cause. 06-09947
02/07/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court previously entered an order directing attorney Jeffery A. Dickerson to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed as recommended by the settlement judge in his report. In light of the assurances in Mr. Dickerson's response, we decline to impose monetary sanctions at this time. Procedural derelictions in the future will likely result in the imposition of sanctions. As this appeal has previously been dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, the clerk shall issue the remittitur forthwith. 07-03117
02/07/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-03119
02/07/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 8, 2007. 07-03119