judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RED HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASS'N VS. KNOPP

Case Information: 46026
Short Caption:RED HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASS'N VS. KNOPPCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44482 , 46095
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A489165Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Parker Nelson & Arin, Chtd.--check no. 14772.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19359
10/21/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts.
01/25/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Docketing Statement and to Comply with NRAP 9(a). Docketing statement and request for transcripts due: 10 days. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 06-01831
02/03/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix.
02/17/2006MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 06-03601
03/08/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 06-05041
03/08/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.