judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CONNORS (TIMOTHY) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 46025
Short Caption:CONNORS (TIMOTHY) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 46552 , 48403 , 50035 , 50086 , 51069 , 51247 , 61749
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C099435Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2005Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 05-19344
10/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. The State shall have 30 days to show cause why a writ should not issue. 05-21111
11/29/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Answer to Order to Show Cause. 05-23419
01/17/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Order Granting Petition for a Writ of Mandamus in Part and Denying Petition in Part. "ORDER the petition GRANTED in part AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to place petitioner's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus on the district court's calendar for resolution and the petition DENIED in all other respects." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-01038
01/17/2006WritIssued Writ. Certified copy of writ and order mailed to Hon. Donald M. Mosley, District Judge, by this office. 06-01056
01/17/2006WritFiled Writ. Served on Hon. Donald M. Mosley, District Judge, by mail from this office on this day. 06-01056
02/14/2006RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 06-01430
02/14/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.