judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILLS (GUY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46032
Short Caption:MILLS (GUY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR971780Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-19399
11/10/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-22136
12/06/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-22450
12/06/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/21/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 9, 2005. 05-22450