judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CINQUE (JAMAA) VS. STATE C/W 46012

Case Information: 46011
Short Caption:CINQUE (JAMAA) VS. STATE C/W 46012Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:46011*, 46012 Related Case(s): 42125 , 46682 , 47886 , 50487 , 53474 , 54335 , 57745
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030873Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-19151
11/10/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 14, 2005. Nos. 46011/46012 cases are not consolidated. 05-22183
11/14/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-22338
11/14/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-22339
11/23/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-23101
11/23/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 05-23102
02/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn1[We have elected to consolidate these appeals for disposition.] These are consolidated appeals. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH. Nos. 46011/46012. 06-04118
03/22/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04430
03/22/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/30/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 23, 2006. 06-04430