judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOULDER OAKS COMM. ASS'N VS. B & J ANDREWS ENTER.

Case Information: 46010
Short Caption:BOULDER OAKS COMM. ASS'N VS. B & J ANDREWS ENTER.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A507818Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:10/04/2005 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/08/2007 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/08/2007How Submitted:After Oral Argument
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro & Schulman, LLP--check no. 1691.
09/27/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19150
10/04/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/11/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 05-20079
10/18/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 05-20583
12/12/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-24198
12/19/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 05-24568
12/30/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 05-25435
03/17/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-05794
03/17/2006AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 06-05796
04/14/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 3, 2006. 06-07915
05/01/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-09095
05/03/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. 06-09243
05/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until June 2, 2006, to file and serve the answering brief. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 06-10846
06/12/2006BriefReceived Answering Brief. 06-12242
06/12/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-12268
07/06/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Filing Answering Brief. The clerk shall file the answering brief received June 12, 2006. Appellant: 30 days to file reply brief, if deemed necessary. 06-13908
07/06/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-12242
07/21/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-15214
10/31/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Law firm of Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro & Schulman, LLP 06-22156
01/29/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on March 8, 2007, at 2:00 p.m. (NNP07-RP/JH/NS) 07-02213
02/22/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 07-04228
03/07/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Beau Sterling associates with Richard Vilkin as counsel for appellant to appear at oral argument. 07-05399
03/08/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP07-RP/JH/NS
11/01/2007Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Parraguirre/Hardesty/Saitta. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Saitta. 123 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 46. NNP07/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Saitta. OPINION WITHDRAWN PER 04/18/08 ORDER. 07-23947
11/15/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Petition for Rehearing and to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. 07-24930
11/28/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. 07-25550
11/28/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Petition for Rehearing due: 12/19/07. 07-25550
12/26/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Sterling Law, LLC-check no. 1047.
12/26/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 07-27911
12/26/2007AppendixFiled Appendix. Statutory Pamphlet, Vols. 1 through 5. 07-27912
04/18/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Withdrawing Opinion and Directing Supplement and Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplement to its rehearing petition. Respondent shall then have 15 days to file and serve an answer. No extensions provided extreme and unforeseen circumstances. Further, we direct the clerk of this court to withdraw our prior opinion from publication pending our resolution of the petition for rehearing. 08-09679
05/08/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Supplement to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Supplemental Brief. 08-11550
05/15/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File its Answer to Appellant's Petition for Rehearing and Supplement Brief. 08-12203
05/23/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answer to the Petition for rehearing and its supplement due: June 23, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-12977
06/23/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. to File Its Answer to Appellant's Petition for Rehearing and Supplemental Brief. 08-15953
06/27/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File its Appellant's Petition for Rehearing and Supplemental Brief. 08-16471
07/01/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. (2nd request) Respondent: 7 days to file the answer to petition for rehearing and the supplement thereto. 08-16795
07/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. (3rd request) Respondent: 7 days to file the answer to petition for rehearing and the supplement thereto. 08-16973
07/14/2008MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Permission to File an Answer to Petition for Rehearing and Supplemental Brief in Excess of Ten (10) Pages. 08-17973
07/18/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. granting motion. The clerk shall file the 22-page 'Answer to Petition for Rehearing and Supplement Brief' and the appendix received on July 14, 2008. 08-18553
07/18/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing and Supplemental Brief. 08-17975
07/18/2008AppendixFiled Appendix. (Pamphlet) Vols. 1 through 3. 08-17977
08/07/2008MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Reply. 08-20466
08/15/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Reply. 08-21094
09/08/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting, in Part, Appellant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply and Granting Respondent Leave to File an Answer to the Reply. Appellant: 10 days to file and serve its reply. Respondent: 10 days from appellant's reply is filed to file and serve an answer. Fn1 [To the extent that appellant requested that they be given until August 12, 2008, to file their response, as that date has already passed, that portion of the motion is denied as moot.] 08-23021
09/26/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. 08-24982
10/02/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for an Extension of Time to file Reply. Reply due: October 21, 2008. 08-25512
10/23/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Reply to Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief. 08-27259
10/28/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer to Appellants' Reply (First Request). 08-27610
11/05/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for an Extension of Time to File Answer to Reply. Respondent: Answer to the Reply due December 4, 2008. 08-28293
12/08/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Reply to Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent. 08-31327
08/20/2009Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Rehearing granted; reversed." Before Parraguirre/Hardesty/Saitta. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Saitta. 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 33. NNP07-Parraguirre/Hardesty/Saitta. 09-20213
08/28/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File it's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration of a Panel Decision and to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. (First Request). 09-20985
09/08/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extenion of time to file Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. En Banc Petition due 9/30/09. fn1[Respondent' s request that this court stay issuance of the remittitur is denied .] 09-21715
09/30/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-23848
09/30/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/01/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File its Petition for En Banc Reconsideration of a Panel Decision (Second Request). 09-23907
10/01/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errato to Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File its Petition for En Banc Reconsideration of a Panel Decision (Second Request). 09-23909
10/07/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2009. 09-23848
10/09/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Permission to File a Petition for En Banc Reconsideration in Excess of Ten (10) Pages. (Total 12 Pages) 09-24737
10/09/2009Post-Judgment PetitionReceived Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. FILED PER ORDER OF 11/10/09. 09-24738
11/10/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of Time to File Petition for En Banc Reconsideration and to Exceed the Page Limit. The clerk of this court shall file repondent's petition for en banc reconsideration, provisionally received in this court on October 9, 2009. 09-27428
11/10/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 09-24738
11/24/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to publishers re: corrections to opinion filed 8/20/09. 09-29447
01/19/2010Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC 10-01517