judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TINER (BRUCE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34806
Short Caption:TINER (BRUCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42733
Lower Court Case(s):Eureka Co. - Seventh Judicial District - 945Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/27/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-08531
09/16/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 9/22/99. 99-09452
10/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon appellant's counsel. 99-10551
11/04/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-10842
11/23/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-11732
12/06/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Affidavit of Mailing the Motion to Extend time to file Docketing Statement and Fast Track Statement. (Envelope enclosed but no copy to be returned). 99-12171
12/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-12542
12/30/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-13441
02/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. We conclude that the briefing in this appeal may now proceed. Appellant: 10 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 60 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[We deny appellant's motion to extend the time to file the fast track statement. This appeal is not subject to the fast track provisions. This appeal must proceed to full briefing.] 00-02376
02/25/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (date not provided) Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. 00-03000
04/17/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 4/17/00. 00-06127
04/17/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-06128
04/21/2000Other Other. Received Table of Contents for appendix. (Inserted into appendix-lc). 00-06426
05/12/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 5/11/00. 00-07927
05/12/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-07929
06/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-10946
06/27/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 25, 2000, appellant filed a transcript request form requesting the preparation of transcripts by court reporter Gloria Jean Smith. To date, no transcripts have been filed. On April 17, 2000, appellant filed an appendix which contains transcripts for proceedings held on April 2, 1999, and July 16, 1999. Although appellant properly included copies of these transcripts in the appendix, he should have filed a certificate of no transcript request instead of a transcript request form. We caution counsel that the court expects compliance with the Nevada Rules of Appellate procedure in the prosecution of any future appeals. 00-12471
10/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-17849
11/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17950
11/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 14, 2000. 00-17950