judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANN T. DWAN v. INDIAN SPRINGS RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., a Wyoming nonprofit corporation

Case Heading (S-07-0154)
Case Number:S-07-0154Case Docketed On:07/13/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:ANN T. DWAN v. INDIAN SPRINGS RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., a Wyoming nonprofit corporation
Full Title:ANN T. DWAN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. INDIAN SPRINGS RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., a Wyoming nonprofit corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAnn T. DwanDavid G. Lewis
AppelleeIndian Springs Ranch Homeowners Association, Inc.Edward Frank Hess
Heather Noble

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 74
Citation:186 P.3d 1199

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/13/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/13/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/30/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/11/2007Brief - Appellee, received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
10/22/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/23/2007Notice-Internal - Veto of expedite recommendationNotice-InternalVetoFinal
10/29/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/08/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/09/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
11/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Frank Hess for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Lewis for appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/12/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David G. Lewis for appellant; Edward Frank Hess for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/30/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/16/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/16/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/21/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal