Case: 15-0536
15-0536
07/21/2015
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
FELCOR/CSS HOLDINGS, LP
CULINAIRE OF FLORIDA, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/02/2015 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Felcor/CSS Holdings, LP. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/30/2015 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
10/16/2015 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
09/15/2015 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
09/11/2015 | Response Waiver filed | Waiver of Response filed on behalf of Culinaire of Florida, Inc. | ||||||
09/02/2015 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Felcor/CSS Holdings, LP. |
| |||||
07/21/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Petition for Review is due September 2, 2015 |
| ||||
07/21/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review. On behalf of FelCor/CSS Holdings, LP. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
11/30/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Culinaire of Florida, Inc. | Respondent | Mr. Michael C. Lawrence Ms. Catherine L. Hanna Mr. Eric Scott Peabody |
FelCor/CSS Holdings, LP | Petitioner | Ms. Susan Hannagan Ms. Melanie Okon Ms. Terah J. Moxley |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-14-00832-CV
Reverse & Remand
___ SW3d ___, 06-17-15
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable David J. Schenck
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Kenneth H. Molberg
DC-14-01571