judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SPARKS (JASON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46021
Short Caption:SPARKS (JASON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43656 , 49419
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C202232Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/09/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 05-19334
10/03/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Redesignation of Appeal. Upon further review, it has been determined that this is not a fast track appeal.
10/03/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment/Order Appealed from filed on 9/2/05. Due Date: 10 days
10/11/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on September 2, 2005. 05-20054
10/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-21178
12/09/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 05-24151
12/09/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. The clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. 06-12311
07/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on July 17, 2006. 06-15366
04/27/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn17[We have reviewed all proper person documents, and conclude that no relief is warranted.] SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-09480
05/22/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-10776
05/22/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 24, 2007. 07-10776