judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MOORE (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46020
Short Caption:MOORE (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51036
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C195428Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 05-19331
10/03/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment/Order Appealed from filed on 9/29/05. Due Date: 10 days
10/11/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Certified copy of a District Court Order filed in the district court September 29, 2005. 05-20094
10/11/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on October 3, 2005. 05-20097
12/19/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 05-24579
01/25/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Notice of Appearance as Pro Bono Counsel. (Attorney Donald Green) 06-01820
01/25/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Additional Time 1. For Filing Request for Rough Draft Transcripts; 2. For Filing Case Appeal Statement; 3. For Filing Docketing Statement; 4. For Filing Opening Brief and Appendix. 06-01824
02/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. no docketing statement is required. Accordingly, the motion for an extension to file the docketing statement is denied as moot. Green is ordered to file a rough draft transcript request form in the district court as required by NRAP 3C(d)(3) within 5 days of this order, and serve the rough draft transcript request form on the court reporters or recorders. Further, Green shall file 2 copies of the transcript request form and proof of service in this court within 10 days of this order. The motion to file a case appeal statement is denied as moot. Green is obligated to file a fast track statement rather than an opening brief. Green shall have 40 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. Green is cautioned that continued failure to comply with this court's orders and rules of appellate procedure may result in the imposition of sanctions. 06-03093
02/24/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Notice of Compliance re: Filing of Amended Request for Rough Draft Transcripts and Proof of Service on Court Reporters/Court Recorders. Transcripts requested: 8/6/05, 8/9/05, 8/10/05, 9/20/05. Court Reporter: Rene Silvaggio. Filed in district court on: 2/21/06/ 06-04179
03/13/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/10/05 and 9/20/05. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 06-05409
04/05/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. and Appendix of Record Due to Filing of Transcripts on March 23, 2006. 06-07107
04/17/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. Rough draft transcripts due: 10 days. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days. 06-07980
04/21/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 8/8/05, 8/9/05 Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduno. 06-08536
04/24/2006MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Permission to File Enlarge Fast Track Statement. 06-08606
04/28/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on April 24, 2006. 06-09040
04/28/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-08608
04/28/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-08610
05/22/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-10706
06/29/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-13460
07/25/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-14447
07/25/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/31/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 27, 2006. 06-14447